EP0553932 - Plastic container which is stackable and nestable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STICHTING BEHEER BROBAN-KRAT Bankastraat 131-B 2585 EL Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states STICHTING BEHEER BROBAN-KRAT Bankastraat 131-B NL-2585 EL Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benraad, Coenraad Johannes Bartholomeus Maria 49, Nieuwe ES NL-7622 BZ Borne / NL | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Iemenschot, Johannes Andreas Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | Iemenschot, Johannes Andreas, Ir. van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 93200232.2 | 28.01.1993 | [1993/31] | Priority number, date | NL19920000159 | 29.01.1992 Original published format: NL 9200159 | [1993/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0553932 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0553932 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D21/06, B65D21/04 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
B65D21/041 (EP);
B65D21/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/31] | Title | German: | Ineinandersetzbarer und stapelbarer Kunststoff-Behälter | [1993/31] | English: | Plastic container which is stackable and nestable | [1993/31] | French: | Récipient en plastique empilable et emboîtable | [1993/31] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.1995 | CH | 28.06.1995 | ES | 28.06.1995 | FR | 28.06.1995 | GR | 28.06.1995 | IT | 28.06.1995 | LI | 28.06.1995 | MC | 28.06.1995 | PT | 28.09.1995 | IE | 28.01.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/18] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
ES | 28.06.1995 | ||
GR | 28.06.1995 | ||
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
MC | 28.06.1995 | ||
PT | 28.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
IE | 28.01.1996 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
ES | 28.06.1995 | ||
GR | 28.06.1995 | ||
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
PT | 28.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
IE | 28.01.1996 | ||
MC | 28.01.1996 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
ES | 28.06.1995 | ||
GR | 28.06.1995 | ||
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
MC | 28.06.1995 | ||
PT | 28.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
IE | 28.01.1996 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
GR | 28.06.1995 | ||
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
MC | 28.06.1995 | ||
PT | 28.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
IE | 28.01.1996 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
GR | 28.06.1995 | ||
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
PT | 28.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
IE | 28.01.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
GR | 28.06.1995 | ||
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
PT | 28.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
IT | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
PT | 28.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [1998/14] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
PT | 28.09.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/18] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
FR | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | CH | 28.06.1995 | |
LI | 28.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3219232 (WILSON JAMES D); | [A]GB2067167 (ENGINEERED PLASTICS SYSTEMS IN); | [Y]GB2104486 (PINCKNEY MOLDED PLASTICS [US]); | [YD]EP0140459 (CURVER BV [NL]) |