EP0558113 - Water-continuous emulsions based on polysaccharides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1996/39] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 NL-3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1996/05] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 NL-3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1993/35] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 NL-3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campbell, Iain James Unilever Research Colworth Lab., Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | 02 /
Morley, Wayne Gerald Unilever Research Colworth Lab., Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | 03 /
Norton, Ian Timothy Unilever Research Colworth Lab., Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Sikken, Antonius H. J. M., et al Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Sikken, Antonius H. J. M., et al UNILEVER N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1996/04] | Eke, Philippa Dianne, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1993/35] | Hartong, Richard Leroy, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 93200312.2 | 05.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | EP19920301629 | 26.02.1992 Original published format: EP 92301629 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558113 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558113 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A23D7/00, A23L1/19, A23L1/24 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
A23D7/011 (EP,US);
A23L27/60 (EP,US);
A23L29/256 (EP,US);
A23L9/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/35] | Title | German: | Emulsionen mit kontinuierlicher Wasserphase auf Basis von Polysacchariden | [1993/35] | English: | Water-continuous emulsions based on polysaccharides | [1993/35] | French: | Emulsions à phase aqueuse continue à base de polysaccharides | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.06.1997
ADMISSIBLE Stichting Behartiging Octrooibelangen Coöperatieve Zuivelindustrie Parkweg 2 2585 JJ DEN HAAG / NL Opponent's representative van Gennip, Johannes Simeon W. Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [1997/33] | 25.07.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.01.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.04.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.04.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1999/43] | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Request for further processing for: | 03.11.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 03.11.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.11.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.09.1996 | DK | 25.09.1996 | PT | 26.12.1996 | GR | 27.12.1996 | IE | 05.02.1997 | [2004/51] |
Former [2001/01] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
CH | 25.09.1996 | ||
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
LI | 25.09.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
IE | 05.02.1997 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
CH | 25.09.1996 | ||
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
LI | 25.09.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | PT | 26.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1648321 ; | [A]EP0005030 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [A]DD152582 (ANGER HORST, et al); | [Y]EP0291228 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [YD]EP0355908 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP0441495 (PFIZER [US]); | [A]EP0455288 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP0463688 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [E]EP0483896 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [YD]EP0432835 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Week 9206, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 92-046794 & SU-A-1 648 321 (FOOD IND CORRSP INS) 15 May 1991, & SU1648321 A 00000000 |