EP0561473 - Counterbalanced orbital drive mechanism for saws and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S-B POWER TOOL COMPANY 4300 West Peterson Avenue Chicago Illinois 60646 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states S-B POWER TOOL COMPANY 4300 West Peterson Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60646 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farmerie, Joseph G. 17660 Lake Drive Muskego, Wisconsin 53150 / US | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinkplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 93200782.6 | 17.03.1993 | [1993/38] | Priority number, date | US19920853108 | 18.03.1992 Original published format: US 853108 | [1993/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561473 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0561473 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B23D49/16, F16F15/22 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
B23D49/165 (EP,US);
B23D51/16 (EP,US);
F16F7/10 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18256 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/38] | Title | German: | Pendelhubantrieb mit Ausgleichgewicht für Sägen oder dergleichen | [1993/38] | English: | Counterbalanced orbital drive mechanism for saws and the like | [1993/38] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement avec mouvement alternatif et oscillant à contrepoids pour des scies et similaires | [1993/38] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 04.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 21.01.1998 | SE | 18.03.1998 | [2003/08] |
Former [1999/02] | SE | 18.03.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3222120 (AEG POWER TOOL CORP APTC [US]); | [A]US4628605 (CLOWERS EARL R [US]); | [A]US5079844 (PALM BERNHARD [US]) |