EP0619524 - A lithographic base and a method for making a lithographic printing plate therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauquier, Guido c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Cortens, Willem c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B 2640 Mortsel / BE | 03 /
Coppens, Paul c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B 2640 Mortsel / BE | 04 /
Vermeersch, Joan c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B 2640 Mortsel / BE | 05 /
Mostaert, Erik c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B 2640 Mortsel / BE | 06 /
Verschueren, Eric c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B 2640 Mortsel / BE | [1994/41] | Application number, filing date | 93200967.3 | 05.04.1993 | [1994/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0619524 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0619524 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/11, B41N1/14 | [1994/41] | CPC: |
B41N3/036 (EP);
G03F7/11 (EP);
B41C1/1008 (EP);
B41C1/1016 (EP);
B41C2210/04 (EP);
B41C2210/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/41] | Title | German: | Lithographischer Träger und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer lithographischen Druckform | [1994/41] | English: | A lithographic base and a method for making a lithographic printing plate therewith | [1994/41] | French: | Support lithographique et méthode pour la production d'un cliché d'impression lithographique | [1994/41] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.08.1999 | FR | 04.08.1999 | NL | 04.08.1999 | GB | 05.04.2000 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/32] | BE | 04.08.1999 | |
FR | 04.08.1999 | ||
GB | 05.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | BE | 04.08.1999 | |
GB | 05.04.2000 | ||
Former [2000/24] | BE | 04.08.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB918735 ; | [AD]GB1419512 ; | [A]US4046946 |