27.06.2008 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
05.10.2005 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
23.07.2004 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
13.07.2004 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
13.07.2004 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
03.04.2004 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
03.04.2004 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
02.08.2003 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] |
07.02.2002 |
Change - appeal |
|
06.12.2001 |
Change - appeal number |
|
04.12.2001 |
Change - appeal |
|
18.09.2001 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
18.09.2001 |
Revocation of patent |
|
13.04.2001 |
Change - German title |
published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] |
06.04.2001 |
Change - German title |
published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] |
16.02.2001 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] |
15.02.2001 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
09.02.2001 |
Change - representative |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
09.02.2001 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
07.02.2001 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
17.07.2000 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
11.05.2000 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
06.03.2000 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
12.01.2000 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
30.08.1999 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
06.08.1999 |
Opposition filed |
published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] |
03.08.1999 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
30.07.1999 |
Opposition filed |
published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] |
11.09.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] |
23.07.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.04.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
07.04.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.12.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.08.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
31.07.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.06.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.06.1997 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
04.04.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.03.1997 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
22.01.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.11.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.06.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.06.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.04.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.01.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.12.1995 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.05.1995 |
First examination report |
|
04.11.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.12.1993 [1993/51] |
03.09.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] |