Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY111790 | 31.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | NL9200685 | 13.04.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL9200685 | 01.11.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | NL9200685 | 13.04.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL9201291 | 16.02.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | NL9201291 | 17.07.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5571943 | 05.11.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US41138895 | 28.03.1995 | NL9200685 | 13.04.1992 | US4581793 | 09.04.1993 | NL9201291 | 17.07.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0648996 | Global Dossier | 22.02.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | NL9200685 | 13.04.1992 | NL9201291 | 17.07.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0566197 | Global Dossier | 28.10.1998 | B1 | EP0566197 | 20.10.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL9200685 | 13.04.1992 | NL9201291 | 17.07.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1045588C | 13.10.1999 | C | CN1088198 | 22.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | NL9200685 | 13.04.1992 | NL9201291 | 17.07.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69321753T | 06.05.1999 | T2 | DE69321753D1 | 03.12.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | NL9200685 | 13.04.1992 | NL9201291 | 17.07.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2125940T | 16.03.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | NL9200685 | 13.04.1992 | NL9201291 | 17.07.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH30749 | 17.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | NL9200685 | 13.04.1992 | NL9201291 | 17.07.1992 |