EP0566197 - Process for preparing primary amines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/42] | Process for preparing primary amines and catalyst system suitable therefor | ||
[1998/44] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Engelhard De Meern B.V. Strijkviertel 67 3454 PK De Meern / NL | [1998/44] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states Engelhard De Meern B.V. Strijkviertel 67 NL-3454 PK De Meern / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borninkhof, Frederik Muntplein 51 NL-3437 AS Nieuwegein / NL | 02 /
Geus, John Wilhelm Gezichtslaan 100 NL-3723 GJ Bilthoven / NL | 03 /
Verhaak, Michael Johannes Franciscus Maria Breedstraat 1 NL-1811 HE Alkmaar / NL | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 93201050.7 | 08.04.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | NL19920000685 | 13.04.1992 Original published format: NL 9200685 | NL19920001291 | 17.07.1992 Original published format: NL 9201291 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0566197 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0566197 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/48 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
C07C209/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von primären Aminen | [1998/44] | English: | Process for preparing primary amines | [1998/44] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'amines primaires | [1998/44] |
Former [1993/42] | Prozess zur Herstellung von primären Aminen sowie ein für diese Reaktion geeignetes Katalysatorsystem | ||
Former [1993/42] | Process for preparing primary amines and catalyst system suitable therefor | ||
Former [1993/42] | Procédé de préparation d'amines primaires et système catalytique apte à ce procédé | Examination procedure | 27.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 16.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.07.1999
24.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Johnson Matthey PLC 2-4 Cockspur Street Trafalgar Square London SW1Y 5BQ / GB Opponent's representative Gibson, Sara Hillary Margaret Synetix Intellectual Property Dept., Building N, Room N101, Chilton Site, P.O. Box 1, Belasis Avenue Billingham, Cleveland TS23 1LB / GB | 02
28.07.1999
09.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Isenbruck, Günter Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.07.1999
24.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Johnson Matthey PLC 2-4 Cockspur Street Trafalgar Square London SW1Y 5BQ / GB Opponent's representative Gibson, Sara Hillary Margaret Synetix Intellectual Property Dept., Building N, Room N101, Chilton Site, P.O. Box 1, Belasis Avenue Billingham, Cleveland TS23 1LB / GB | ||
02
28.07.1999
09.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Isenbruck, Günter Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2003/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.07.1999
24.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Johnson Matthey PLC 2-4 Cockspur Street Trafalgar Square London SW1Y 5BQ / GB Opponent's representative Gibson, Sara Hillary Margaret Synetix Intellectual Property Dept., Building N, Room N101, Chilton Site, P.O. Box 1, Belasis Avenue Billingham, Cleveland TS23 1LB / GB | ||
02
28.07.1999
09.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Isenbruck, Günter, Dr. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2001/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.07.1999
24.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB Opponent's representative Gibson, Sara Hillary Margaret Synetix Intellectual Property Dept., Building N, Room N101, Chilton Site, P.O. Box 1, Belasis Avenue Billingham, Cleveland TS23 1LB / GB | ||
02
28.07.1999
09.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Isenbruck, Günter, Dr. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2001/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.07.1999
24.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB Opponent's representative Gibson, Sara Hillary Margaret, et al, et al Imperial Chemical Industries plc, ICI Group Intellectual Property, P.O. Box 90, Wilton Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | ||
02
28.07.1999
09.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Isenbruck, Günter, Dr. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [1999/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.07.1999
03.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE Celanese Chemicals Europe GmbH Werk Ruhrchemie Patentreferat Postfach 13 01 60 46128 Oberhausen / DE | ||
02
28.07.1999
09.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Isenbruck, Günter, Dr. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [1999/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.07.1999
03.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE Celanese Chemicals Europe GmbH Werk Ruhrchemie Patentreferat Postfach 13 01 60 46128 Oberhausen / DE | 02.09.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.05.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.04.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.09.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.06.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/37] | Appeal following opposition | 27.11.2001 | Appeal received No. T1253/01 | 30.01.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.06.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0340848 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [X]US3987099 (HOCKELE GUNTER, et al); | [X]DE1518118 ; | [X]EP0424738 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]FR2194685 (DAVY ASHMORE AG [DE]); | [A]DE1193671 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [A]EP0322760 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [AD]EP0316761 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]DE902616 (BAYER AG) |