EP0566198 - In vitro gene selection by means of RNA carriers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 14.01.1998 [1998/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENICHEM S.p.A. Piazza della Repubblica, 16 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states ENICHEM S.p.A. Piazza della Repubblica, 16 I-20124 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rossi, Nicoletta Viale Palmiro Togliatti 1604 I-00100 Rome / IT | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1994/19] | De Carli, Erberto ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1993/42] | Roggero, Sergio Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 93201054.9 | 13.04.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | IT1992MI00892 | 13.04.1992 Original published format: IT MI920892 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0566198 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0566198 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/10, C12N15/11, // C12N15/12 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
C12N15/10 (EP);
C12Q1/6865 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | In-vitro-Genselektion mit Hilfe von Träger-RNS | [1993/42] | English: | In vitro gene selection by means of RNA carriers | [1993/42] | French: | Sélection des gènes in vitro à l'aide d'ARN porteuses | [1993/42] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/47] | 12.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/03] | 01.10.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/03] | 01.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0329822 (CANGENE CORP [CA]); | [A]WO9010064 (GENENTECH INC [US]); | [A]WO9118115 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) | [DA] - OTSUKA ET AL., MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, (198103), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 269 - 280 |