EP0569091 - Magnetic resonance apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boeijen, Gerardus Wilhelmus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Wardenier, Peter Hanzen c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1993/45] | Representative(s) | Bakker, Hendrik, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Bakker, Hendrik, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1993/45] | Veenstra, Gustaaf, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 93201255.2 | 03.05.1993 | [1993/45] | Priority number, date | EP19920201295 | 07.05.1992 Original published format: EP 92201295 | [1993/45] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569091 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569091 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/36 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
G01R33/3628 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/45] | Title | German: | Kernspinresonanzapparat | [1993/45] | English: | Magnetic resonance apparatus | [1993/45] | French: | Appareil à résonance magnétique | [1993/45] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/27] | 30.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 05.08.1998 | [2003/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4739271 ; | [A]FR2590993 ; | [A]US4827219 ; | [A]WO9007128 ; | [A]US4931734 ; | [A]EP0412568 ; | [AD]EP0083728 | [Y] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E. SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS vol. 14, no. 6, 1 June 1981, BRISTOL GB pages 700 - 701 M. PERIÉ ET AL. 'SIMPLE RF MATCHING FOR NMR COILS IN ENDOR SPECTROMETERS' | [A] - MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE. vol. 3, no. 2, 1 April 1986, DULUTH,MN US pages 346 - 351 J.F. MARTIN ET AL. 'TRANSMISSION LINE MATCHING OF SURFACE COILS' | [A] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E. SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS vol. 17, no. 8, 1 August 1984, BRISTOL GB pages 691 - 693 L. TYKARSKI 'MEASUREMENTS OF NMR DISPERSION WITH A MARGINAL OSCILLATOR' |