EP0573121 - Method and device for controlling a combing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.08.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRATELLI MARZOLI & C. S.p.A. Via Verdi, 11 I-24100 Bergamo / IT | [1995/49] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states INDUSTRIE MECCANOTESSILI MARZOLI S.r.l. Via Matris Domini, 8 I-24100 Bergamo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Locatelli, Claudio Via S. Alberto, 2 I-25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio, Brescia / IT | 02 /
Baitelli, Gian Mario Via S. Alberto, 2 I-25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio, Brescia / IT | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1993/49] | De Carli, Erberto ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 93201580.3 | 02.06.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | IT1992MI01362 | 03.06.1992 Original published format: IT MI921362 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573121 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573121 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D01G19/26, D01G19/16 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
D01G19/26 (EP,US);
D01G19/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Steuern einer Kämmaschine | [1993/49] | English: | Method and device for controlling a combing machine | [1993/49] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour commander une machine de peignage | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.1996
WITHDRAWN MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klostertsrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.1996
WITHDRAWN Maschinenfabrik Rieter AG CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | 29.10.1996 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 18.12.1996 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 15.01.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.04.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.08.2001 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/40] | Appeal following opposition | 28.04.1999 | Appeal received No. T0480/99 | 24.06.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.01.2001 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2001/03] | 10.04.2001 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2001/15] | 06.08.2001 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 06.08.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH432312 (SCHLUMBERGER CIE N [FR]); | [A]CH485873 (MAREMONT CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0437807 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]); | [Y]EP0455171 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) |