EP0573125 - Device for reducing peelable products such as potatoes in size to a predetermined shape [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BACKUS BEHEER B.V. Laurens Janszoon Costerstraat 16 NL-5916 PS Venlo / NL | [1993/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Backus, Stephanus Michael Marie Burg. Van Deelensingel 75 NL-5941 BB Velden / NL | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Bleukx, Lucas Lodewijk M., et al Bleukx Consultancy BVBA Derde Straat 7 3680 Maaseik / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bleukx, Lucas Lodewijk M., et al Bleukx Consultancy BVBA Derde Straat 7 3680 Maaseik / BE | ||
Former [1999/10] | Bleukx, Lucas Lodewijk M., et al Hydro S.A. Avenue Marcel Thiry 83 1200 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1998/16] | Bartelds, Erik, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1993/49] | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinkplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 93201618.1 | 07.06.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | NL19920000993 | 05.06.1992 Original published format: NL 9200993 | [1993/49] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573125 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573125 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A23N7/02, A23N15/06 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
A23N15/06 (EP,US);
A23N7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verkleinern schälbarer Produkte, wie zum Beispiel Kartoffeln, auf eine vorbestimmte Form | [1993/49] | English: | Device for reducing peelable products such as potatoes in size to a predetermined shape | [1993/49] | French: | Dispositif pour la réduction en taille à une forme prédeterminée des produits épluchables tels que des pommes de terre | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 31.05.1994 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 28.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.1997
01.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE Oy FORMIT Foodprocessing Ab Storängsvägen 4, P.O. Box 3 64201 Närpes / FI Opponent's representative Görg, Klaus, et al, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.1997
01.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE Oy FORMIT Foodprocessing Ab Storängsvägen 4, P.O. Box 3 64201 Närpes / FI Opponent's representative Görg, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.1997
01.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE Oy FORMIT Foodprocessing Ab Storängsvägen 4, P.O. Box 3 64201 Närpes / FI Opponent's representative Feiring, Knut Olof Finn, et al, et al Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | 24.07.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.02.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.09.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.02.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.02.2000 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 18.12.2002 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/12] | 18.12.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.12.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 30.03.2000 | Appeal received No. T0353/00 | 16.05.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.12.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 25.09.1996 | ES | 25.09.1996 | IT | 25.09.1996 | SE | 25.12.1996 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
ES | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | SE | 25.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3426510 (ENGELHOLM TORBJOERN); | [A]CH407632 (DAMES HANS JOACHIM [DE]); | [A]DE69821 ; | [A]EP0077512 (KJELLMAN FREDRIK [FI]) |