EP0582332 - Positive-action device for bringing about the rotary movement of a hatch with secure locking thereof in the open position [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIVA CALZONI S.p.A. Via Emilia Ponente 72 Bologna / IT | [1995/17] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states RIVA CALZONI S.p.A. Via Stendhal, 34 I-20144 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ortelli, Aurelio Via Saragozza 115 Bologna / IT | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Raimondi, Alfredo, et al Dott. Ing. Prof. Alfredo Raimondi S.r.l., Piazza le Cadorna 15 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Raimondi, Alfredo, Dott. Ing. Prof., et al Dott. Ing. Prof. RAIMONDI ALFREDO S.r.l. Piazzale Cadorna 15 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 93202136.3 | 21.07.1993 | [1994/06] | Priority number, date | IT1992MI01933 | 05.08.1992 Original published format: IT MI921933 | [1994/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582332 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582332 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B63G8/38, E05C17/32 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
E05C17/32 (EP,US);
B63G8/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/06] | Title | German: | Positiv-Wirkungs-Gerät zur Herstellung einer Drehbewegung eines Lukendeckels mit Arretierung desselben in der Offenstellung | [1994/06] | English: | Positive-action device for bringing about the rotary movement of a hatch with secure locking thereof in the open position | [1994/06] | French: | Dispositif d'action positive pour l'achèvement d'un mouvement rotatif d'un couvercle'écoutille avec verrouillage de celle-ci dans la position ouverte | [1994/06] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 10.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR392968 (JOHN COCKERILL [BE]) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 3 - line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB124454 (DAWSON ARTHUR TREVOR [GB], et al) [A] 1,3,5 * page 4, line 19 - line 47; figures 3,4 *; | [XY]US1873243 (CHARLES ZEBROWSKI) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column W * [Y] 4; | [Y]US3044106 (PAPSDORF ROBERT A) [Y] 4 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US3179010 (BRATTON JOHN T) [A] 1* column 2, line 17 - line 33; figure 3 * |