EP0582333 - Antipercolation gas-diffusion electrode and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01 60015 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01, Reuterweg 14 D-60015 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allen, Robert J. 130 Adams Street Saugus, MA 01906 / US | 02 /
Vora, Ravindra J. 1630 Worcester Road, Unit 303C Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 03 /
DeMarinis, Michael 18 Lincoln Street, Apt. No.5 Milford, MA 01751 / US | [1994/06] | Application number, filing date | 93202141.3 | 21.07.1993 | [1994/06] | Priority number, date | US19920924094 | 03.08.1992 Original published format: US 924094 | [1994/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582333 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582333 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/86 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
H01M4/86 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/06] | Title | German: | Antiperkolation Gasdiffusionselektrode und Verfahren zur deren Herstellung | [1994/06] | English: | Antipercolation gas-diffusion electrode and method of making same | [1994/06] | French: | Electrode à diffusion gazeuse anti-percolation et méthode de fabrication de celle-ci | [1994/06] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 02.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 06.09.1996 | [1997/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9211662 (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]) [A] 1-24 * claims 1-20 *; | [A]US3930094 (SAMPSON RONALD N, et al) [A] 1-24 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]US3899354 (KORDESCH KARL V) [A] 1-24 * claims 1-12 * |