EP0584860 - Selective partial hydrogenation of conjugated diene polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gibler, Carma Joleen 410 Southchester Lane Houston, Texas 77079 / US | 02 /
Chamberlain, Linda rae 2010 Thompson Crossing Drive Richmond, Texas 77469 / US | 03 /
Hoxmeier, Ronald James 2823 Waypark Houston, Texas 77082 / US | [1994/09] | Application number, filing date | 93202349.2 | 09.08.1993 | [1994/09] | Priority number, date | US19920927904 | 10.08.1992 Original published format: US 927904 | [1994/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584860 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584860 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08C19/02, C08F8/04 | [1994/09] | CPC: |
C08F8/04 (EP,US);
C08C19/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/09] | Title | German: | Selektive und partielle Hydrierung von Polymeren von konjugierten Dienen | [1994/09] | English: | Selective partial hydrogenation of conjugated diene polymers | [1994/09] | French: | Hydrogénation sélective et partielle de polymères de diènes conjugués | [1994/09] | Examination procedure | 11.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/36] | 29.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0460725 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1,11 * page 2, line 56 - line 58; claims 1,15 * * page 3, line 18 - line 24 *; | [X]EP0339986 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,11 * claims 1,20,24 * * page 6, line 13 - line 15; examples 23-24 *; | [A]EP0315280 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 * |