EP0587213 - Image formation by thermal transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Podszun, Wolfgang, c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., DIE 3800 Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Uytterhoeven, Herman Jozef c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V.DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | 03 /
Beels, Roland Francois c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V.DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | 04 /
Leenders, Luc Herwig c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | [1994/11] | Application number, filing date | 93202364.1 | 12.08.1993 | [1994/11] | Priority number, date | EP19920202632 | 31.08.1992 Original published format: EP 92202632 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587213 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587213 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/34, G03F7/028 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
G03F7/34 (EP);
G03F7/0285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/11] | Title | German: | Mittels Wärmeübertragung erzeugtes Bild | [1994/11] | English: | Image formation by thermal transfer | [1994/11] | French: | Image crée par transfert thermique | [1994/11] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 12.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.05.2000 | FR | 31.05.2000 | NL | 31.05.2000 | DE | 31.08.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 31.05.2000 | |
FR | 31.05.2000 | ||
NL | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | BE | 31.05.2000 | |
NL | 31.05.2000 | ||
FR | 27.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/24] | BE | 31.05.2000 | |
FR | 27.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | BE | 31.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4859568 (K. TAKEDA) [X] 1,2,4,11-20 * column 10, line 47 - line 59 * * column 11, line 30 - line 53 *; | [X]DE4125699 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1447765 (E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS) |