EP0588402 - A semiconductor memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:DE
FR
IT
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
NL
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1994/12] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
NL
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Berkel, Cornelis, c/o PHILIPS RESEARCH LAB. Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | 02 /
Bird, Neil Christopher, c/o PHILIPS RESEARCH LAB. Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Brian Thomas, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [1995/10] |
Former [1994/12] | Clark, Jane Anne Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93202417.7 | 17.08.1993 | [1994/12] | Priority number, date | GB19920017743 | 19.08.1992 Original published format: GB 9217743 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0588402 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0588402 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11C17/14, G11C17/18, G11C16/04, H01L27/12, H01L27/115, G11C16/06, H01L21/84 | [1995/29] | CPC: |
H01L27/1203 (EP,US);
G11C16/0466 (EP,US);
G11C16/0491 (EP,US);
H01L21/84 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/04] | G11C17/14, G11C17/18, G11C16/04, H01L27/12, H01L27/115, G11C16/06 | ||
Former IPC [1994/12] | G11C17/14, G11C17/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/12] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicheranordnung | [1994/12] | English: | A semiconductor memory device | [1994/12] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteurs | [1994/12] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 19.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/09] | 30.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03174000 ; | [DA]US4173791 (BELL ANTONY G [US]); | [A]US4727515 (HSU SHENG T [US]); | [A]EP0338766 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US5057885 (MATSUMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) |