EP0599358 - Electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bungo, Edward Martin 379 Cherry Hill Lane Cortland, Ohio 44410 / US | 02 /
Chupak, John Marvin Rd No. 1, Box 13 Hogue Drive West Middlesex, Pennsylvania 16159 / US | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | Denton, Michael John, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | ||
Former [1994/22] | Jehan, Robert Patent Section, 1st Floor, Gideon House, 28 Chapel Street Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93202472.2 | 23.08.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | US19920982532 | 27.11.1992 Original published format: US 982532 | [1994/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599358 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599358 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/52 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
H01R13/5219 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/22] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Verbinder | [1994/22] | English: | Electrical connector | [1994/22] | French: | Connecteur électrique | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 23.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2881406 (ARSON SAMUEL L) [A] 1* column 3, line 39 - line 57; figures 4-6 *; | [A]DE2352032 (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH) [A] 1 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 2; figure 2 *; | [A]US4498719 (JURIS MITCHELL A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figures 3A-C,5 * |