EP0648835 - Use of alkaline polyammonium salts to increase cationic density in fabric softeners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.07.1996 [1996/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demeyere, Hugo Jean Marie Linthoutstraat 59 B-1785 Merchtem / BE | 02 /
De Block, Franciscus Joseph Madeleine Wolvertemsesteenweg 214 B-1785 Merchtem / BE | 03 /
Pangrle, Brian Joseph Laarbeeklaan 15 B-1090 Jette / BE | 04 /
Boutique, Jean-Pol 32, rue Emile Labarre B-5800 Gembloux / BE | 05 /
Philippi, Michel Jean Hector 11, rue Dielhere B-1350 Marilles / BE | 06 /
Bodet, Jean-François St. Nicolas Avenue Gosforth IE99 1EE, Newcastle / GB | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 93202884.8 | 14.10.1993 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0648835 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/00, C11D1/645, C11D3/30 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
C11D1/645 (EP);
C11D1/62 (EP);
C11D3/0015 (EP);
C11D3/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/16] | Title | German: | Verwendung von alkalischen Polyammoniumsalzen zur Verbesserung der Kationendichte von Textilweichmachern | [1995/16] | English: | Use of alkaline polyammonium salts to increase cationic density in fabric softeners | [1995/16] | French: | Utilisation de sels alcalins de polyammonium pour augmenter la densité cationique des adoussinants textiles | [1995/16] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 22.05.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.11.1994 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 | 30.11.1994 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   10.12.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9316157 (HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN) [X] 1-6 * page 9, formula V *;; claim - *; | [X]EP0165138 (STEPAN EUROPE) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 14 - page 5, line 3 * * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 35; claim - *; | [X]EP0296995 (COTELLE S.A.) [X] 1-6 * page 3, line 44 - page 5, line 15 * * page 5, line 57 - page 6, line 25 * * page 6, line 44 - line 47; claim - *; | [X]JPS58172308 ; | [D]JPH0212203B (AJINOMOTO KK); | [DA]EP0507003 (REWO CHEMISCHE WERKE GMBH.) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0069948 (HOECHST AG.) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0060003 (THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY) [A] 1-7 * claim - * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 46, Database accession no. 83-818125, & JPS58172308 A 19831011 (AJINOMOTO KK) [X] 1-7 * abstract * |