EP0598439 - Display device using scan velocity modulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1994/21] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Traa, Willebrordus Gerardus c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Jonker, Jan Hendrik c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1994/21] | Representative(s) | Kooiman, Josephus Johannes Antonius, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | Kooiman, Josephus Johannes Antonius, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 93203138.8 | 10.11.1993 | [1994/21] | Priority number, date | EP19920203524 | 17.11.1992 Original published format: EP 92203524 | [1994/21] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0598439 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0598439 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0598439 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/32 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
H04N3/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/21] | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung mit Modulation der Abtastgeschwindigkeit | [1994/21] | English: | Display device using scan velocity modulation | [1994/21] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage avec modulation de vitesse de balayage | [1994/21] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 05.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 07.10.1998 | IT | 07.10.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 07.10.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]US4183064 (SAHARA ET AL.) [DY] 1,5-7 * column 1, line 47 - line 64 * * column 5, line 28 - line 43; claims 1,3 * [A] 8; | [Y]EP0454082 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1,5-7 * page 4, line 12 - line 26; claim 4 *; | [A]EP0246339 (DEUTSCHE ITT INDUSTRIES GMBH) [A] 2-4 * abstract *; | [A]US4970442 (HARADA) [A] 2-4 * abstract *; | [A]US4356436 (BARTEN ET AL.); | [A]FR2506547 (THOMSON-CSF) |