EP0605034 - Scaffolding construction, in particular means for joining two or more of its posts in vertical position [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SGB HOLDINGS LTD.for these Research & Development Dept. Holland Maasheseweg 79 NL-5804 AB Venray / NL | [1994/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Helmond, Johannes, Hubertus, Maria Calsstraat 106 NL-5707 JV Helmond / NL | [1994/27] | Representative(s) | Lips, Hendrik Jan George HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 2596 HG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | Lips, Hendrik Jan George, Ir. HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 93203457.2 | 09.12.1993 | [1994/27] | Priority number, date | NL19920002269 | 28.12.1992 Original published format: NL 9202269 | [1994/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0605034 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0605034 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0605034 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E04G1/06, E04G7/30 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
E04G7/301 (EP,US);
Y10T403/5741 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/27] | Title | German: | Baugerüst-Ausführung, insbesondere Massnahmen zur Verbindung von zwei oder mehr ihrer Pfosten senkrecht übereinander | [1994/27] | English: | Scaffolding construction, in particular means for joining two or more of its posts in vertical position | [1994/27] | French: | Construction d'échafaudage, en particulier moyen pour la jonction de deux ou plusieurs tubes verticaux | [1994/27] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 09.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.11.1996 | BE | 20.11.1996 | CH | 20.11.1996 | DK | 20.11.1996 | FR | 20.11.1996 | IT | 20.11.1996 | LI | 20.11.1996 | LU | 31.12.1996 | [2004/35] |
Former [2000/52] | AT | 20.11.1996 | |
BE | 20.11.1996 | ||
CH | 20.11.1996 | ||
DK | 20.11.1996 | ||
IT | 20.11.1996 | ||
LI | 20.11.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
FR | 18.04.1997 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 20.11.1996 | |
BE | 20.11.1996 | ||
DK | 20.11.1996 | ||
IT | 20.11.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
CH | 25.02.1997 | ||
LI | 25.02.1997 | ||
FR | 18.04.1997 | ||
Former [2000/07] | AT | 20.11.1996 | |
BE | 20.11.1996 | ||
DK | 20.11.1996 | ||
IT | 20.11.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
FR | 18.04.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 20.11.1996 | |
BE | 20.11.1996 | ||
DK | 20.11.1996 | ||
IT | 20.11.1996 | ||
FR | 18.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 20.11.1996 | |
BE | 20.11.1996 | ||
DK | 20.11.1996 | ||
FR | 18.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/44] | AT | 20.11.1996 | |
BE | 20.11.1996 | ||
FR | 18.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | AT | 20.11.1996 | |
BE | 20.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 20.11.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB779295 (ZIGMUND JOSEPH JAGIEL, et al) [A] 1,3,6* the whole document *; | [A]CH671814 (KERN AG CONRAD) [A] 1,6 * the whole document * |