EP0602726 - Connector assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL Tour Fiat, 1 Place de la Coupole, Cédex 16 92084 Paris La Défense / FR | [1998/11] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL Tour Fiat, 1 Place de la Coupole, Cédex 16 F-92084 Paris La Défense / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jonckheere, Luc Kattebroekstraat 215 B-1700 Dilbeek / BE | 02 /
Morlion, Danny Kriekerijstraat 30 B-9040 St. Amandsberg (Ghent) / BE | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2009/40] |
Former [1998/11] | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke, et al De Vries & Metman, Overschiestraat 184 N 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [1994/25] | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke, et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 NL-1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 93203458.0 | 09.12.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | NL19920002173 | 16.12.1992 Original published format: NL 9202173 | [1994/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0602726 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0602726 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38, H01R23/66, H01R23/68 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
H01R12/71 (EP,US);
G02B6/3817 (EP,US);
G02B6/3869 (EP,US);
G02B6/3873 (EP,US);
G02B6/3885 (EP,US);
G02B6/3888 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/25] | Title | German: | Steckverbinderaufbau | [1994/25] | English: | Connector assembly | [1994/25] | French: | Assemblage de connecteur | [1994/25] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.03.1998 | ES | 11.03.1998 | IT | 11.03.1998 | LI | 11.03.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | CH | 11.03.1998 | |
ES | 11.03.1998 | ||
IT | 11.03.1998 | ||
LI | 11.03.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 11.03.1998 | |
IT | 11.03.1998 | ||
LI | 11.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/50] | CH | 11.03.1998 | |
LI | 11.03.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4116532 (HUBBARD WILLIAM MARSHALL, et al); | [A]GB2039074 (PLESSEY CO LTD); | [A]US5091988 (DEGANI YINON [US], et al); | [A]US5159654 (SALTER JAMES R [US]) | Examination | EP0571037 |