Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0602726
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.08.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] |
28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
15.01.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] |
23.10.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] |
23.01.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] |
13.01.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.08.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.06.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
13.06.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.03.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
14.01.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.08.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.03.1996 |
First examination report |
|
21.03.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.06.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] |
06.05.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] |