EP0602729 - Railway joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1997 | Revocation of patent | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EDGAR ALLEN ENGINEERING LIMITED P.O. Box 42 Shepcote Lane Sheffield, S9 1QW / GB | For all designated states BRITISH RAILWAYS BOARD Euston House, 24 Eversholt Street, P.O. Box 100 London NW1 1DZ / GB | [1994/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Connelly, Raymond, c/o Edgar Allen Eng. Ltd. P.O. Box 42, Shepcote Lane Sheffield S9 1QW / GB | 02 /
Pendleton, Desmond Roy, c/o Edgar Allen Eng. Ltd. P.O. Box 42, Shepcote Lane Sheffield S9 1QW / GB | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Long, Edward Anthony, et al Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | Long, Edward Anthony, et al Hulse & Co. Eagle Star House, Carver Street Sheffield S1 4FP / GB | Application number, filing date | 93203462.2 | 09.12.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | GB19920026081 | 15.12.1992 Original published format: GB 9226081 | [1994/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0602729 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0602729 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, B23K33/00, E01B7/12 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
B23K35/004 (EP);
B23K11/04 (EP);
B23K2103/04 (EP);
B23K2103/18 (EP);
C21D9/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/25] | Title | German: | Schienenverbindung | [1994/25] | English: | Railway joint | [1994/25] | French: | Joint de rails | [1994/25] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.10.1996
17.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE VAE Aktiengesellschaft Rotenturmstrasse 5-9 1010 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Haffner, Thomas M. Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte KG Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.10.1996
17.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE VAE Aktiengesellschaft Rotenturmstrasse 5-9 1010 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Haffner, Thomas M. Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte OG Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | 15.11.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.03.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.04.1997 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1552392 (VOEST AG) [A] 1-5 *Claims*; | [A]EP0070774 (CREUSOT LOIRE [FR]) [A] 1-5 *Claims and page 3, lines 2-8*; | [A]EP0181251 (C3F COMP FRANC FORGES FOND [FR])[A] 1-5; | [A]EP0213111 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]) [A] 1-5 *Claims*; | [A]EP0260233 (BREDA FUCINE SPA [IT]) [A] 1-5 *Claims*; | [A]US5041174 (PONS FERNAND [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 *Claims* | [A] - PECKNER AND BERNSTEIN, Handbook of Stainless Steels, US, MCGRAW HILL BOOK COMPANY, (1977) [A] 1-5 *4-16, 4-17, 26-8, 26-9, 26-10* | Examination | EP0467881 |