EP0601670 - Braided graphite-foil composite and method of application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crosier, Robert Anthony 17221 Belle Isle Drive Huntersville North Carolina 28078 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states Crosier, Robert Anthony 17221 Belle Isle Drive Huntersville, North Carolina 28078 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Boelsma, Gerben Harm Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | Boelsma, Gerben Harm, Ir. van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 93203465.5 | 09.12.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | US19920987640 | 09.12.1992 Original published format: US 987640 | [1994/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0601670 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0601670 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/52, B32B18/00, F16J15/20 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
B32B18/00 (EP);
B29C63/065 (EP);
C04B35/536 (EP);
C04B35/80 (EP);
F16J15/20 (EP);
F16J15/22 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1994/24] | C04B35/54, B32B18/00, F16J15/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/24] | Title | German: | Geflochtener Graphit-Folieverbund und Verfahren zUr Verwendung | [1994/24] | English: | Braided graphite-foil composite and method of application | [1994/24] | French: | Composite graphite-feuille et procédé d'utilisation | [1994/24] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 21.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.06.1996 | CH | 19.06.1996 | DK | 19.06.1996 | GR | 19.06.1996 | LI | 19.06.1996 | PT | 19.09.1996 | SE | 19.09.1996 | IE | 09.12.1996 | LU | 31.12.1996 | [2001/05] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 19.06.1996 | |
CH | 19.06.1996 | ||
DK | 19.06.1996 | ||
GR | 19.06.1996 | ||
LI | 19.06.1996 | ||
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
SE | 19.09.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 19.06.1996 | |
CH | 19.06.1996 | ||
DK | 19.06.1996 | ||
LI | 19.06.1996 | ||
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
SE | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 19.06.1996 | |
CH | 19.06.1996 | ||
LI | 19.06.1996 | ||
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
SE | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | AT | 19.06.1996 | |
PT | 19.09.1996 | ||
SE | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 19.06.1996 | |
SE | 19.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 19.06.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3404061 (SHANE JAMES H, et al) [A] 1,7-12 * column 1, line 58 - column 5, line 40; figures 2,8,10,15; claims 1,10 * * column 10, line 34 - column 17, line 9 *; | [A]FR2054807 (GORE & ASS, et al) [A] 1-5,7* page 2, line 5 - page 7, line 24; figures 4-7; examples 1,3; claims 1,5,7-10 *; | [DA]EP0340303 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP]) [DA] 1,7,8,10 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1; figures 9,10; claims 1-3,7-21,31-35 * * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 1 * |