EP0590740 - A cathode ray tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1998 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1998 [1998/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | ||
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itou, Takeo, c/o Patent Division Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Matsuda, Hidemi, c/o Patent Division Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Hajime, c/o Patent Division Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 93203466.3 | 29.03.1989 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | JP19880152259 | 22.06.1988 Original published format: JP 15225988 | JP19880076255 | 31.03.1988 Original published format: JP 7625588 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0590740 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0590740 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590740 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/86, H01J29/89, C09K3/16 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
H01J29/898 (EP,US);
H01J29/88 (KR);
H01J29/86 (KR);
H01J29/868 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/14] | H01J29/86, H01J29/89 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/14] | Title | German: | Kathoderstrahlröhre | [1994/14] | English: | A cathode ray tube | [1994/14] | French: | Tube à rayons cathodique | [1994/14] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 14.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89303093.2 / EP0335680 | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61118932 ; | [A]JPS62280286 ; | [A]GB2161320 (RCA CORP) [A] 1,2,4,7,12 * page 1, line 38 - line 51 * * page 1, line 73 - line 106 * * page 2, line 37 - line 41 * * page 2, line 62 - line 71; figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861017), vol. 10, no. 306, Database accession no. (E - 446)<2362>, & JP61118932 A 19860606 (HITACHI) [A] 1,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880521), vol. 12, no. 172, Database accession no. (C - 497)<3019>, & JP62280286 A 19871205 (TAIYO BUSSAN) [A] 1,12 * abstract * |