Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0605047
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
20.12.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.02.2002 [2002/06] |
29.12.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.02.2001 [2001/07] |
30.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.07.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.05.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
15.05.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.02.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.11.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.07.1999 |
First examination report |
|
15.07.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.12.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.10.1998 |
Change - name/address |
published on 02.12.1998 [1998/49] |
02.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.11.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.12.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] |
20.05.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] |