Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0605047 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2001 | B1 | EP0605047 | 06.07.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL9202284 | 29.12.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE199198T | 15.02.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | NL9202284 | 29.12.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69329932T | 02.08.2001 | T2 | DE69329932D1 | 22.03.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | NL9202284 | 29.12.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0605047T | 18.06.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | NL9202284 | 29.12.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2155065T | 01.05.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | NL9202284 | 29.12.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL9202284 | 18.07.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | NL9202284 | 29.12.1992 |