EP0605047 - Method for blockwise encryption/decryption using linear algebraic codes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Stationsplein 7 9726 AE Groningen / NL | [1998/49] |
Former [1994/27] | For all designated states Koninklijke PTT Nederland N.V. P.O. Box 95321 NL-2509 CH The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1994/27] | Application number, filing date | 93203640.3 | 23.12.1993 | [1994/27] | Priority number, date | NL19920002284 | 29.12.1992 Original published format: NL 9202284 | [1994/27] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0605047 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0605047 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/06 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
H04L9/0618 (EP);
H04L2209/12 (EP);
H04L2209/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur blockweisen Verschlüsselung/Entschlüsselung unter Verwendung von algebraischen linearen Codes | [1994/27] | English: | Method for blockwise encryption/decryption using linear algebraic codes | [1994/27] | French: | Procédé de chiffrage/déchiffrage par blocs utilisant des codes algébriques linéaires | [1994/27] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 20.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 14.02.2001 | PT | 14.05.2001 | [2004/07] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 14.02.2001 | |
PT | 14.05.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA] - ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY - CRYPTO 87 16-20 August 1987, NEW YORK (US) pages 445-457; R.STRUIK & J. van TILBURG: [DA] 1 * "THE RAO-NAM SCHEME IS INSECURE AGAINST A CHOSEN- PLAINTEXT ATTACK" * * page 445, line 2 - page 446, line 11 * * page 455, line 6 - line 24 * | [A] - ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY - CRYPTO 88 21-25 August 1987, BERLIN (DE) pages 540-563; T.HWANG & T.R.N.RAO: [A] 1 * "SECRET ERROR-CORRECTING CODES (SECC)" * * page 549, line 1 - page 550, line 15 * * page 555, line 1 - page 559, line 7 * | [DA] - T.R.N.RAO & K.H.NAM, "PRIVATE-KEY ALGEBRAIC-CODE ENCRYPTIONS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, NEW YORK US, (198907), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 829 - 833 [DA] 1 * page 830, column R, line 41 - page 831, column R, line 28 * * table 1 * |