EP0576107 - Use of a steel for the manufacture of constructiontubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Hagen, Ingo Schumannstrasse 1 W-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
Menne, Ulrich Dipl.-Ing. Essener Strasse 44a 45529 Hattingen / DE | 03 /
Hoffmann, Ulrich Falkstrasse 97 W-4100 Duisburg / DE | 04 /
Vogelsang, Bernhard Zum Hucklenbruch 13 W-4018 Langenfeld / DE | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 93250116.6 | 21.04.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | DE19924219336 | 10.06.1992 Original published format: DE 4219336 | [1993/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576107 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0576107 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C22C38/38 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
C22C38/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/52] | Title | German: | Verwendung eines Stahles zur Herstellung von Konstruktionsrohren | [1993/52] | English: | Use of a steel for the manufacture of constructiontubes | [1993/52] | French: | Utilisation d'un acier pour la fabrication de tubes | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 28.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.06.1995 | NL | 14.06.1995 | [2003/08] |
Former [1996/15] | GB | 14.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2163454 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]GB2195658 (BRITISH STEEL CORP); | [A]US3830669 (MATSUOKA T, et al); | [A]GB1083466 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) |