EP0590747 - A beta1-6N-acetylglucosaminyltransferase and a method for cloning proteins having enzymatic activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/14] | A novel-beta1- 6 N-acetylglucosaminyltransferase, its acceptor molecule, leukosialin, and a method for cloning proteins having enzymatic activity | ||
[1999/26] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LA JOLLA CANCER RESEARCH FOUNDATION 10901 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [1994/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuda, Minoru 2818 Passy Avenue San Diego, California 92122 / US | 02 /
Bierhuizen, Marti F. A. Schiedamseweg 225 NL-3119 JB Schiedam / NL | [1995/45] |
Former [1994/14] | 01 /
Fukuda, Minoru 2818 Passy Avenue San Diego, California 92122 / US | ||
02 /
Bierhuizen, Marti F. A. Schiedamseweg 225 NL-3119 JB Schiedam / US | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93250268.5 | 29.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | US19920955041 | 01.10.1992 Original published format: US 955041 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0590747 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0590747 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/54, C12N9/10, C12N15/12, C12N15/86, C12N15/64, C12N5/10 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C07K14/70596 (EP,US);
C12N15/64 (EP,US);
C12N9/1051 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/14] | C12N15/54, C12N9/10, C12N15/12, C07K13/00, C12N15/86, C12N15/64, C12N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | Beta-6-N-Acetylglukosaminyltransferase und Verfahren zur Klonierung enzymatisch-aktiven Proteinen | [1999/26] | English: | A beta1-6N-acetylglucosaminyltransferase and a method for cloning proteins having enzymatic activity | [1999/26] | French: | Bêta-6-N-acétylglusaminyltransférase et méthode pour le clonage de protéines avec activité enzymatique | [1999/26] |
Former [1994/14] | Beta-6-N-Acetylglukosaminyltransferase, das Akzeptor-Molekül, Leukosialin und Verfahren zur Klonierung enzymatisch-aktiven Proteinen | ||
Former [1994/14] | A novel-beta1- 6 N-acetylglucosaminyltransferase, its acceptor molecule, leukosialin, and a method for cloning proteins having enzymatic activity | ||
Former [1994/14] | Bêta-6-N-acetylglucosaminyltransferase, l'accepteur leukosialin et méthode pour le clonage de protéines avec activité enzymatique | Examination procedure | 13.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 10.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX] - ADAM PALLANT ET AL., "Characterization of cDNAs encoding human leukosialin and localization of the lekosialin gene to chromosome 16", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., WASHINGTON US, (198902), vol. 86, no. 4, pages 1328 - 1332 [DX] 9-15 * abstract * * page 1329, column L, paragraph 3 - page 1330, column L, paragraph 4 * * page 1331, column R, paragraph 2 - page 1332, column L, paragraph 1 * | [X] - SHINICHI KUDO ET AL., "A short, novel promoter sequence confers the expression of human leukosialin, amajor sialoglycoprotein on leukocytes", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, BALTIMORE, MD US, (19910505), vol. 266, no. 13, pages 8483 - 8489, XP002978098 [X] 9-15 * abstract * * page 8484, column R, paragraph 2 - page 8485, column L, paragraph 1; figure 2 * | [X] - C. SIMON SHELLEY ET AL., "Molecular characterization of sialophorin (CD43), the lymphocyte surface sialoglycoprotein defective in Wiskott-Aldrich syndrome", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., WASHINGTON US, (198904), vol. 86, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.86.8.2819, pages 2819 - 2823, XP002052839 [X] 9-15 * abstract * * page 2820, column R, paragraph 3; figure 2 * * page 2822, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.86.8.2819 | [X] - MICHAEL HEFFERNAN ET AL., "Polyoma and hamster papovavirus large T antigen-mediated replication of expression shuttle vectors in Chinese hamster ovary cells", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH., ARLINGTON, VIRGINIA US, (19910111), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 85 - 92, XP008070010 [X] 16-23 * page 85, column R, paragraph 2 - page 86, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 86, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 87, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 90, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 91, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 2 * | [PX] - MARTI F.A. BIERHUIZEN ET AL., "Expression cloning of a cDNA encoding UDP-GlcNAc:Gal-beta-1-3-GalNAc-R (GlcNAc to GalNAc) beta-1-6GlcNAc transferase by gene transfer into CHO cells expressing polyoma large tumor antigens", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., WASHINGTON US, (19921001), vol. 89, no. 19, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.89.19.9326, pages 9326 - 9330, XP002961059 [PX] 1-8,16-25 * abstract * * page 9326, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 9327, column L, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * * page 9327, column R, paragraph 3 - page 9328, column R, paragraph 1; figure 3 * * page 9329, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 9329, column R, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.19.9326 |