EP0550424 - Optical gas sensor with enriching polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 02.12.1998 [1998/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mauze, Ganapati Ramnath 1114 West Knickerbocker Drive Sunnyvle, California 94087 / US | 02 /
Gray, Damien Francis 1590 Latham Street Mountain View, California 94041 / US | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | Powell, Stephen David, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300003.6 | 04.01.1993 | [1993/27] | Priority number, date | US19920816987 | 03.01.1992 Original published format: US 816987 | [1993/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0550424 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0550424 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G01N21/64, G01N21/77 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
G01N21/7703 (EP,US);
G01N33/4925 (EP,US);
G01N2021/0385 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6432 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6434 (EP,US);
G01N21/3504 (EP,US);
G01N2201/084 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/27] | Title | German: | Optischer Gassensor mit Gasanreicherungspolymer | [1993/27] | English: | Optical gas sensor with enriching polymer | [1993/27] | French: | Capteur de gaz optique avec polymère pour l'enrichissement de gaz | [1993/27] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 30.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/49] | 18.07.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2132348 (UNIV VIRGINIA) [Y] 7-9 * page 3, line 39 - page 4, line 96 * [A] 1,3,4,10; | [XAY]EP0144713 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [X] 1-3,10 * page 1, paragraph 6 - page 4, paragraph 1; page 5, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 2; figures 1-7 * [A] 4,6 [Y] 7,9; | [A]EP0190830 (GOULD INC [US]) [A] 1,3,7-10 * page 7, line 12 - page 10, line 28; figures 1-4 *; | [XAY]EP0253559 (BARD INC C R [US]) [X] 4-6,10 * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 16; page 6, line 40 - page 7, line 51; page 9, lines 5-17; claims 17,18; figures 1-3 * [A] 1-3 [Y] 8; | [PXA]EP0489347 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [PX] 4,5,8,10 * page 5, lines 4-54; page 6, lines 21-29; figure 1 *[PA] 6,9 | [YA] - M. LANGSAM ET AL:, "Poly(trimethylsilylpropyne): a unique polymeric absorbent for the removal of trace organics from air and water sources", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19911202), vol. 115, no. 22, Database accession no. 238775z, page 427, column L [Y] 9 * abstract * [A] 6 | [ ] - POLYM. PREP., (1991), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 87 - 88 | [A] - K. TAKADA ET AL:, "Studies on the applications of substituted poly(acetylene) VI. Oxygen enriching membranes for poly[1-(trimethylsilyl)-1-propyne]. Fabrication of ultra-thin film and its composite membrane", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890529), vol. 110, no. 22, Database accession no. 194161, page 53, column R [A] 6,9 * abstract * | [ ] - KOBUNSHI RONBUNSHU, (1989), vol. 46, no. 1, pages 1 - 6 |