EP0606692 - Method and apparatus for injecting sludge into a kiln [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1998 [1998/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYSTECH ENVIRONMENTAL CORPORATION 245 North Valley Road Xenia Ohio 45385 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states SYSTECH ENVIRONMENTAL CORPORATION 245 North Valley Road Xenia, Ohio 45385 / US | ||
Former [1994/29] | For all designated states LAFARGE CORPORATION 11130 Sunrise Valley Dr. Reston, Virginia 22091-4332 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carpenter, Keith Herbert 908C Great View Circle Centerville, Ohio 45459 / US | [1994/29] | Representative(s) | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300188.5 | 13.01.1993 | [1994/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0606692 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0606692 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/44, F23G7/00, F23G5/033 | [1994/29] | CPC: |
C04B7/4438 (EP,US);
F23G5/033 (EP,US);
F23G5/442 (EP,US);
F23G7/001 (EP,US);
F23K3/02 (EP,US);
Y02P40/125 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B7/4438, C04B7/4423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DK, ES, FR [1994/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Eindüsen von Schlamm in einen Drehrohrofen | [1994/29] | English: | Method and apparatus for injecting sludge into a kiln | [1994/29] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour injecter de la boue dans un four rotatif | [1994/29] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 09.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5076179 (CARPENTER KEITH H [US]); | [A]US3315900 (WALTER TWIST, et al); | [A]LU66804 ; | [AD]US4022630 (WATSON DAVID, et al); | [AD]US4850290 (BENOIT MICHEL R [US], et al) |