EP0607642 - Compositions for topical application to the skin for treatment and/or prevention of radiation-induced skin damage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PERRICONE, Nicholas V., Dr. 27 Coginchaug Court Guilford Connecticut 06437 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states PERRICONE, Nicholas V., Dr. 27 Coginchaug Court Guilford, Connecticut 06437 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300324.6 | 19.01.1993 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0607642 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0607642 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/42, A61K31/375 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
A61Q19/004 (EP);
A61K31/375 (EP);
A61K8/676 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/30] | Title | German: | Mittel zur topischen Anwendung auf der Haut zur Behandlung und/oder zur Verhütung von, durch Strahlen verursachten Hautschäden | [1999/06] | English: | Compositions for topical application to the skin for treatment and/or prevention of radiation-induced skin damage | [1994/30] | French: | Compositions pour application topique sur la peau pour le traitement et/ou la prévention des dommages occasionnés par des radiations | [1994/30] |
Former [1994/30] | Mittel zur Behandlung und/oder zur Verhütung von, durch Strahlen verursachte Hautschäden durch topischer Anwendung auf die Haut | Examination procedure | 20.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 06.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2000 | BE | 27.09.2000 | GR | 27.09.2000 | DK | 27.12.2000 | PT | 27.12.2000 | SE | 27.12.2000 | IE | 19.01.2001 | LU | 19.01.2001 | MC | 31.01.2001 | [2006/39] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
BE | 27.09.2000 | ||
GR | 27.09.2000 | ||
DK | 27.12.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
IE | 19.01.2001 | ||
LU | 19.01.2001 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
BE | 27.09.2000 | ||
GR | 27.09.2000 | ||
DK | 27.12.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
IE | 19.01.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
BE | 27.09.2000 | ||
DK | 27.12.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
IE | 19.01.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
BE | 27.09.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
IE | 19.01.2001 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 27.09.2000 | |
BE | 27.09.2000 | ||
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | BE | 27.09.2000 | |
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | BE | 27.09.2000 | |
PT | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | PT | 27.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61151107 ; | [X]JP63185910 ; | [X]JP62081307 ; | [X]JP62026210 ; | [X]FR2244468 (PASSWATER RICHARD [US]); | [X]DE2744976 (FRAU ELISABETH FRUCHT FABRIK K); | [X]EP0308918 (SANSHO SEIYAKU KK [JP]); | [Y]US4818521 (TAMABUCHI HIROSHI [JP]); | [Y]WO9012572 (UNIV DUKE [US]); | [X]US5078989 (ANDO HIDEYA [JP], et al); | [X]FR2666226 (THOREL JEAN NOEL); | [X]US5122536 (PERRICONE NICHOLAS V [US]); | [Y]WO9215292 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 350 (C-387)(2406) & JP-A-61 151 107 ( KANEBO ), & JP61151107 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 467 (C-550)(3314) & JP-A-63 185 910 ( KANEBO ), & JP63185910 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 282 (C-446) & JP-A-62 081 307 ( KANEBO ), & JP62081307 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 202 (C-432)(2649) & JP-A-62 026 210 ( TAISHO PHARMACEUT CO. ), & JP62026210 A 00000000 | [X] - SOAP, COSMETICS, CHEMICAL SPECIALTIES vol. 68, no. 8, 1992, NEW YORK , US page 70 'natural moisturizing & repair cream' |