EP0554001 - System and method for feeding paste material or slurry into a furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION Perryville Corporate Park Clinton New Jersey 08809-4000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION Perryville Corporate Park Clinton New Jersey 08809-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tang, John 1320 Butler Street Easton, PA / US | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Anthony Charles Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | Rackham, Anthony Charles Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300390.7 | 20.01.1993 | [1993/31] | Priority number, date | US19920826556 | 27.01.1992 Original published format: US 826556 | [1993/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0554001 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0554001 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0554001 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/44 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
F23G5/442 (EP,KR,US);
F23L1/00 (KR);
F23G5/30 (KR);
Y02E20/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GB, IT, PT [1993/31] | Title | German: | Einrichtung und Verfahren zum Zuführen von pastösem Material oder Schlamm in einen Ofen | [1993/31] | English: | System and method for feeding paste material or slurry into a furnace | [1993/31] | French: | Système et procédé pour amener du matériau pâteux ou de la boue à un four | [1993/31] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 07.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 31.01.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3484948 (WHELAN JOHN CAMPBELL); | [A]DE4025588 |