EP0552979 - Apparatus and method for de-interleaving data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | New entry: Termination of opposition procedure: despatch of decision | 10.09.2004 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-Dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do 441-370 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-Dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 441-370 / KR | ||
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [1993/30] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 416 Maetan 3-dong, Kwonsun-ku Suwon, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Hong Soo 213-806, Dongshin Apt., Jungja-Dong Jangan-Gu, Suwon-City, Kyungki-Do / KR | [1993/30] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300475.6 | 22.01.1993 | [1993/30] | Priority number, date | KR19880000692 | 23.01.1992 Original published format: KR 88692 | [1993/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0552979 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0552979 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0552979 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/27, H04N7/00 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
H03M13/2764 (EP,US);
H04N21/439 (KR);
H04N5/602 (EP,US);
H04N7/01 (KR);
H04N7/083 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/30] | H03M13/22, H04N7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/30] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zum Entschachteln von Daten | [1993/30] | English: | Apparatus and method for de-interleaving data | [1993/30] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour désentrelacer des données | [2000/22] |
Former [1993/30] | Appareil et méthode pour descentraliser des données | Examination procedure | 01.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 27.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V. Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V. Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Eichstädt, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | 21.06.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.05.2004 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2004/44] | 09.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.01.2003 | DE | 01.08.2003 | FR | 30.09.2003 | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/18] | DE | 01.08.2003 | |
FR | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | DE | 01.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0213961 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,11 * page 4, line 23 - page 14, line 22; figure - * [A] 1-3,6-10; | [XA]EP0222386 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5,11 * page 9, line 4 - page 22, line 28; figure - * [A] 2-4,6-10; | [A]FR2637146 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1,5,7-11 * page 3, line 18 - page 10, line 36; figure - *; | [A]EP0289050 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,7,11 * page 3, column 4, line 43 - page 5, column 8, line 18; figure - * | Examination | US5063533 | EP0246767 |