EP0554026 - Method and apparatus for removing oil from articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.1994 [1994/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON TECHNO CO., LTD. 661-3, Oaza-Minaminakano Omiya-city Saitama-prefecture / JP | For all designated states TOHO GAS CO., LTD. 19-18, Sakurada-cho, Atsuta-ku Nagoya City Aichi-prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states NIHON TECHNO CO., LTD. 661-3, Oaza-Minaminakano Omiya-city, Saitama-prefecture / JP | ||
For all designated states TOHO GAS CO., LTD. 19-18, Sakurada-cho, Atsuta-ku Nagoya City, Aichi-prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kabasawa, Hitoshi, c/o Nihon Techno Co., Ltd No. 661-3, Oaza-Minaminakano Omiya-city, Saitama-prefecture / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Haruki, c/o Toyota Motor Corporation No. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-city, Aichi-prefecture / JP | 03 /
Sasaki, Noboru, c/o Toyota Motor Corporation No. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-city, Aichi-prefecture / JP | 04 /
Eriguchi, Tadashi, c/o Toyota Motor Corporation No. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-city, Aichi-prefecture / JP | 05 /
Hattori, Masao No. 2-160 Hassha, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi-prefecture / JP | 06 /
Marubayashi, Hiroaki A-34 Hozo shataku, No. 2-26, Hozo-cho, Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi-prefecture / JP | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300500.1 | 25.01.1993 | [1993/31] | Priority number, date | JP19920012102 | 27.01.1992 Original published format: JP 1210292 | [1993/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0554026 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C23G5/00 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
C23G5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Öl von Gegenständen | [1993/31] | English: | Method and apparatus for removing oil from articles | [1993/31] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour enlever de l'huile d'articles | [1993/31] | File destroyed: | 02.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/42] | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4141373 ; | [AP]US5137581 ; | [AD]JPS6071077 |