EP0558184 - An optical head including a beam splitter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/35] | Beam splitter | ||
[1998/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Masato, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha Kosugi-Jigyosho 53 Imaikami-cho, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300540.7 | 26.01.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | JP19920038465 | 30.01.1992 Original published format: JP 3846592 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0558184 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0558184 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558184 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/135, G02B27/14, G02B27/28, G11B7/22, G02B7/18 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
G11B7/1356 (EP,US);
G02B27/1006 (EP,US);
G02B27/1073 (EP,US);
G02B27/1093 (EP,US);
G02B7/1805 (EP,US);
G11B11/10543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/35] | Title | German: | Optischer Kopf mit einem Strahlenteiler | [1998/21] | English: | An optical head including a beam splitter | [1998/21] | French: | Tête optique comprenant un séparateur de faisceaux | [1998/21] |
Former [1993/35] | Strahlenteiler | ||
Former [1993/35] | Beam splitter | ||
Former [1993/35] | Séparateur de faisceaux | Examination procedure | 07.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/40] | 13.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Request for further processing for: | 04.06.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 04.06.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.05.1998 | NL | 20.05.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | IT | 20.05.1998 | |
NL | 20.05.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 20.05.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP02093501 ; | [A]JP63120574 ; | [A]JP01134322 ; | [A]US4907858 (HARA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0468685 (CANON KK [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 298 (P-1068)27 June 1990 & JP-A-02 093 501 ( CANON INC ), & JP02093501 A 19900627 | [A] - MACHINE DESIGN vol. 39, no. 23, 28 September 1967, CLEVELAND US pages 128 - 130 D.S.L. DURIE 'Keeping Light Beams on Target' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 369 (E-665)4 October 1988 & JP-A-63 120 574 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO. LTD ), & JP63120574 A 19881004 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 382 (P-923)24 August 1989 & JP-A-01 134 322 ( HITACHI ELECTRON ENG. CO. LTD ), & JP01134322 A 19890824 | Examination | US3788733 | EP0067405 |