EP0554106 - Water-inactivatable, pressure sensitive adhesive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADHESIVES RESEARCH, INC. Route 216 Glen Rock Pennsylvania 17327 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states ADHESIVES RESEARCH, INC. Route 216 Glen Rock, Pennsylvania 17327 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Therriault, Donald J. 4249 Old Orchard Road York, Pennsylvania 17402 / US | 02 /
Zajaczkowski, Michael J. 86B West Walnut Street Yoe, Pennsylvania 17313 / US | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | Burford, Anthony Frederick W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300660.3 | 29.01.1993 | [1993/31] | Priority number, date | US19920828685 | 31.01.1992 Original published format: US 828685 | [1993/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0554106 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0554106 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C09J151/00 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
C09J151/00 (EP,US);
A61L15/58 (EP,US);
C09J7/385 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2887 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2891 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/58, C08L33/04 (EP,US);
A61L15/58, C08L51/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/31] | Title | German: | Durch Wasser inaktivierbarer, druckempfindlicher Klebstoff | [1993/31] | English: | Water-inactivatable, pressure sensitive adhesive | [1993/31] | French: | Adhésif sensible à la pression et non-activable par l'eau | [1993/31] | Examination procedure | 08.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 12.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.04.1996 | BE | 10.04.1996 | CH | 10.04.1996 | IT | 10.04.1996 | LI | 10.04.1996 | [2008/05] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
BE | 10.04.1996 | ||
CH | 10.04.1996 | ||
IT | 10.04.1996 | ||
LI | 10.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
BE | 10.04.1996 | ||
CH | 10.04.1996 | ||
LI | 10.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/20] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
BE | 10.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 10.04.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4554324 (HUSMAN JAMES R [US], et al); | [AD]US5032637 (THERRIAULT DONALD J [US], et al) | Examination | EP0104046 |