EP0609593 - Optical filters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BARR & STROUD LIMITED 1 Linthouse Road Glasgow G51 4BZ Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states BARR & STROUD LIMITED 1 Linthouse Road Glasgow G51 4BZ, Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kelly, Christopher Joseph 117 Welbeck Crescent, Troon Ayrshire, KA10 6AR, Scotland / GB | 02 /
Biagi, Michael Anthony 85 Nethercraigs Road Paisley, PA2 8SG, Scotland / GB | 03 /
Monachan, Brian Cochrane 89 Rannoch Drive Bearsden, Glasgow, Scotland / GB | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300794.0 | 03.02.1993 | [1994/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609593 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609593 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/28 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
G02B5/285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/32] | Title | German: | Optische Filter | [1994/32] | English: | Optical filters | [1994/32] | French: | Filtres optiques | [1994/32] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1993 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 31.01.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 11.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 20.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.12.1995 | CH | 20.12.1995 | DK | 20.12.1995 | ES | 20.12.1995 | LI | 20.12.1995 | NL | 20.12.1995 | SE | 20.03.1996 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/26] | BE | 20.12.1995 | |
CH | 20.12.1995 | ||
DK | 20.12.1995 | ||
ES | 20.12.1995 | ||
LI | 20.12.1995 | ||
SE | 20.03.1996 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 20.12.1995 | |
CH | 20.12.1995 | ||
DK | 20.12.1995 | ||
LI | 20.12.1995 | ||
SE | 20.03.1996 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 20.12.1995 | |
DK | 20.12.1995 | ||
SE | 20.03.1996 | ||
CH | 26.03.1996 | ||
LI | 26.03.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 20.12.1995 | |
DK | 20.12.1995 | ||
SE | 20.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/32] | BE | 20.12.1995 | |
SE | 20.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 20.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9216875 ; | [A]US5179468 ; | [A]EP0522850 ; | [A]US2890624 |