EP0555080 - Carbon composite electrode material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/32] | Method for manufacturing carbon composite electrode material | ||
[1996/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Kazuo 192-1 Hajikami, Shinjo-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Hideaki Rorerukotoesuta-gakuenmae 507, 2-116-5, Daiwa-cho Gakuen, Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Mitate, Takehito 192-1 Hajikami, Shinjo-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Yoshikawa, Masaharu 4-11-30 Shirakashi-cho Kashihara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300813.8 | 04.02.1993 | [1993/32] | Priority number, date | JP19920017969 | 04.02.1992 Original published format: JP 1796992 | [1993/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0555080 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0555080 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/96, H01M10/40, C01B31/04 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
D01F11/125 (EP,US);
D01F11/127 (EP,US);
D01F9/1271 (EP,US);
H01M4/96 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/32] | Title | German: | Kohlenstoff-Verbund-Elektrodenmaterial | [1996/20] | English: | Carbon composite electrode material | [1996/20] | French: | Matériau composite en carbone destiné à des électrodes | [1996/20] |
Former [1993/32] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kohlenstoff-Verbund-Elektrodenmaterial | ||
Former [1993/32] | Method for manufacturing carbon composite electrode material | ||
Former [1993/32] | Méthode pour la fabrication d'un matériau composite carbone électrodes | Examination procedure | 16.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 13.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0419090 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]EP0334501 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [AD]EP0346088 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [AD]EP0239410 (SHARP KK [JP]) |