EP0566229 - Method and apparatus for deinterlacing video inputs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nVIEW CORPORATION 11835 Canon Boulevard Newport News Virginia 23606 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states nVIEW CORPORATION 11835 Canon Boulevard Newport News, Virginia 23606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogeley, James H. 210 York View Road Yorktown, Virginia 23692 / US | 02 /
Kosin, Kenneth 4 Marcella Road Hampton, Virginia 23666 / US | 03 /
Jones, Garth S. 940 Royal Oak Close Virginia Beach, Virginia 23452 / US | 04 /
Trani, Stephen S. 315 24th Street Virginia Beach, Virginia 23451 / US | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Smith, Martin Stanley Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Smith, Martin Stanley Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300903.7 | 05.02.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | US19920830409 | 05.02.1992 Original published format: US 830409 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0566229 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0566229 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/16 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
H04N7/012 (EP,US);
H04N3/28 (KR);
G09G5/00 (EP,US);
G09G5/395 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0229 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Aufheben des Zeilensprungverfahren von Videoeingangssignalen | [1993/42] | English: | Method and apparatus for deinterlacing video inputs | [1993/42] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour supprimer l'entrelacement de signaux d'entrée vidéo | [1993/42] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 12.10.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 10.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 25.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/18] | 27.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.04.1993 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | 16.04.1993 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.09.1996 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4215414 (HUELSMAN KENNETH A [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4788540 (TOKUMITSU SHIGENORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]US4922118 (MAESHIMA KAZUYA [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |