EP0558260 - Method for formation of contact vias in integrated circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton, TX 75006-5039 / US | [1999/08] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS, INC. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, Kuei-Wu 9825 w. Valley Ranch Parkway No.1220 Irving, Dallas County, Texas 75063 / US | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Roger, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1993/35] | Application number, filing date | 93301304.7 | 23.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | US19920843507 | 28.02.1992 Original published format: US 843507 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558260 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558260 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768, H01L21/311 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
H01L21/76802 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/35] | H01L21/90, H01L21/311 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/35] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren von Kontaktöffnungen in integrierten Schaltungen | [1993/35] | English: | Method for formation of contact vias in integrated circuits | [1993/35] | French: | Méthode de formation de vias de contact dans des circuits intégrés | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 06.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4489481 (JONES GARY W [US]); | [X]BE901350 (ITT IND BELGIUM); | [X]EP0388862 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [XP]EP0488546 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]) |