EP0558294 - Ink supply device and ink jet recording apparatus using said device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Kiyoharu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Uchida, Takashi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93301362.5 | 24.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | JP19920039490 | 26.02.1992 Original published format: JP 3949092 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0558294 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0558294 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558294 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] |
Former [1995/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP0558294 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[1995/50] | |||
[1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
B41J2/1707 (EP,US);
B41J2/17563 (EP,US);
B41J2/17596 (EP,US);
B41J2202/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/35] | Title | German: | Farbstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät mit Tintenversorgungsvorrichtung | [1993/35] | English: | Ink supply device and ink jet recording apparatus using said device | [1993/35] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre muni d'un dispositif d'alimentation en encre | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 11.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/36] | 05.04.1995 | New documents discovered [1995/21] | 26.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0437547 ; | [A]JPS60204356 ; | [A]US4456916 (KOCOT RAYMOND H [US]) [A] 4-7 * abstract *; | [A]US4476472 (AIBA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 4-7 * column 2, line 15 - column 4, line 20; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4769658 (ODA GEN [JP], et al) [A] 2,9 * abstract * | [X] - SMITH; TOMEK, "ink jet pump", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (197707), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 560 - 561 [X] 1,8 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920519), vol. 016, no. 212, Database accession no. (M - 1250), & JP04037547 A 19920207 (MITA IND CO LTD) [X] 1,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860305), vol. 010, no. 055, Database accession no. (M - 458), & JP60204356 A 19851015 (CANON K.K.) [A] 4-7 * abstract * |