blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0581405

EP0581405 - Module for automatically controlling a polymer processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2000
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pardikes, Dennis G.
12811 South 82nd Court Palos Park
Illinois 60464 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/05]For all designated states
Pardikes, Dennis G.
12811 South 82nd Court
Palos Park, Illinois 60464 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1994/05]
Representative(s)Bond, Bentley George, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
[1997/36]
Former [1997/33]Bond, Bentley George, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Temple Gate House Temple Gate
Bristol BS1 6PT / GB
Former [1994/05]Yeadon, Mary Elizabeth, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date93301478.926.02.1993
[1994/05]
Priority number, dateUS1992084340928.02.1992         Original published format: US 843409
US1993001241216.02.1993         Original published format: US 12412
[1994/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0581405
Date:02.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0581405
Date:15.06.1994
Language:EN
[1994/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0581405
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.1994
ClassificationIPC:G05D11/08, G01N21/21
[1994/05]
CPC:
G01N21/534 (EP,US); B01F23/49 (EP,US); B01F23/483 (EP,US);
B01F25/43161 (EP,US); B01F25/51 (EP,US); B01F35/2112 (EP,US);
G01N33/04 (EP,US); G01N33/442 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/05]
TitleGerman:Modul zur automatischen Steuerung eines Polymer-Bearbeitungssystems[1994/05]
English:Module for automatically controlling a polymer processing system[1994/05]
French:Module de contrôle automatique d'un système de traitement de polymère[1994/05]
Examination procedure08.09.1994Examination requested  [1994/44]
29.04.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
18.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.1999Fee for grant paid
13.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT15.12.1999
[2008/05]
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4857750  (MILLIS EDWIN G [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 14; figures 1-3 * [A] 6,8,10,11,13,14;
 [YA]WO8905973  (BIO RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1,13,14 * page 12, line 33 - page 23, line 14 * * page 35, line 32 - page 36, line 5; figures 1-5 * [A] 4,5,8,9,16;
 [YA]EP0272673  (PASSAVANT WERKE [DE]) [Y] 1,13,14 * column 3, line 19 - column 7, line 11; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,3,11;
 [A]US4976871  (BANKS RODNEY H [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7,14,16 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 51; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]EP0393196  (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-7,9-11,13,14 * page 5, line 28 - page 9, line 9; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0165802  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-5,10,13,14 * page 6, line 8 - page 11, line 9; figures 1-3A *;
 [A]WO8606483  (DATAMIC AB [FI]) [A] 1-5,9-13 * page 2, line 34 - page 6, line 6; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]  - KAHLE ET AL., "haes- a hybrid absorbtion/emission spectrometer for on-line multicomponent analysis of liquids", ADVANCES IN INSTRUMENTATION AND CONTROL, RESEARCH TRIANGLE PARK US, (1992), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 1287 - 1294, XP000328958 [A] * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.