EP0559485 - Thermoplastic resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagaoka, Kenji 832-4, Shiizu Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | 02 /
Hagimori, Hiroshi 1353-4, Shiizu Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | 03 /
Kitadono, Kaoru 1-9, Yushudainishi Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | [1997/20] |
Former [1993/36] | 01 /
Nagaoka, Kenji 832-4, Shiizu Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | ||
02 /
Hagimori, Hiroshi 1353-4, Shiiu Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | |||
03 /
Kitadono, Kaoru 1-9, Yushudainishi Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1993/36] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93301682.6 | 05.03.1993 | [1993/36] | Priority number, date | JP19920049357 | 06.03.1992 Original published format: JP 4935792 | [1993/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0559485 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0559485 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/00, C08L71/12, C08K5/00, C08K13/04, // (C08L77/00, 71:12),(C08L71/12, 77:00) | [1993/36] | CPC: |
C08L71/123 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/123, C08L77/00 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L71/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/36] | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Harzzusammensetzung | [1993/36] | English: | Thermoplastic resin composition | [1993/36] | French: | Composition de résine thermoplastique | [1993/36] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.05.1997 | FR | 14.05.1997 | IT | 14.05.1997 | NL | 14.05.1997 | DE | 15.08.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | BE | 14.05.1997 | |
IT | 14.05.1997 | ||
NL | 14.05.1997 | ||
DE | 15.08.1997 | ||
FR | 10.10.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 14.05.1997 | |
IT | 14.05.1997 | ||
DE | 15.08.1997 | ||
FR | 10.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | BE | 14.05.1997 | |
DE | 15.08.1997 | ||
FR | 10.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | BE | 14.05.1997 | |
DE | 15.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | DE | 15.08.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0375177 ; | [X]EP0337814 ; | [X]EP0270247 |