EP0561545 - Closure for containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.06.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M C G CLOSURES LIMITED P O Box 32, Bromford Lane West Bromwich West Midlands B70 7HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states M C G CLOSURES LIMITED P O Box 32, Bromford Lane West Bromwich, West Midlands B70 7HY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thompson, Nigel 45 Lea Vale Road, Norton Stourbridge, West Midland DY8 2AT / GB | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Peter John Hunter, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1M 1FD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | Stebbing, Peter John Hunter, et al Ablett & Stebbing 45 Lancaster Mews Lancaster Gate London W2 3QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93301773.3 | 09.03.1993 | [1993/38] | Priority number, date | GB19920005375 | 12.03.1992 Original published format: GB 9205375 | [1993/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561545 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0561545 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/34 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
B65D41/3447 (EP,US);
B65D2401/35 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/38] | Title | German: | Behälterverschluss | [1993/38] | English: | Closure for containers | [1993/38] | French: | Fermeture pour récipients | [1993/38] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.1996
25.09.1996
ADMISSIBLE CROWN CORK AG Römerstrasse 83 CH-4153 Reinach / CH Opponent's representative Hepp, Dieter Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.1996
25.09.1996
ADMISSIBLE CROWN CORK AG Römerstrasse 83 CH-4153 Reinach / CH Opponent's representative Hepp, Dieter Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | 21.10.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.03.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.06.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.07.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.03.2000 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/33] | Appeal following opposition | 10.09.1998 | Appeal received No. T0912/98 | 05.11.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.03.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 14.03.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.03.2000 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 31.03.1996 | IE | 09.03.2000 | LU | 09.03.2000 | ES | 10.03.2000 | [2006/50] |
Former [2004/39] | IE | 09.03.2000 | |
LU | 09.03.2000 | ||
ES | 10.03.2000 | ||
Former [2004/38] | IE | 09.03.2000 | |
ES | 10.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | IE | 09.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1592689 (PATEL C S); | [A]EP0154611 (GUALA ANGELO SPA [IT]); | [A]DE8806295U ; | [A]DE3912137 (BERG JACOB GMBH CO KG [DE]); | [YD]EP0408364 (METAL CLOSURES GROUP LTD [GB]); | [Y]WO9111369 (CROWN CORK AG [CH]) |