blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0564202

EP0564202 - Image output method and apparatus with cache memory [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/40]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sugaya, Akio, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1993/40]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/40]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date93302411.929.03.1993
[1993/40]
Priority number, dateJP1992007459630.03.1992         Original published format: JP 7459692
JP1992031588130.10.1992         Original published format: JP 31588192
[1993/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0564202
Date:06.10.1993
Language:EN
[1993/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0564202
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.1993
ClassificationIPC:G06K15/02
[1993/40]
CPC:
G06K15/02 (EP,KR,US); G06K2215/002 (EP,US); G06K2215/0022 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0031 (EP,US); G06K2215/0051 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1993/40]
TitleGerman:Bilderzeugungsverfahren und -anlage mit Pufferspeicher[1993/40]
English:Image output method and apparatus with cache memory[1993/40]
French:Méthode et dispositif de sortie d'images avec mémoire tampon[1993/40]
Examination procedure23.02.1994Examination requested  [1994/16]
12.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.06.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.1999Fee for grant paid
24.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Request for further processing for:24.06.1998Request for further processing filed
24.06.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.07.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
18.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0354024  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0453221  (CANON KK [JP]);
 [X]WO9119275  (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT JAPAN [JP]);
 [A]EP0478304  (BROTHER IND LTD [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.