EP0568206 - Bipolar transistor and method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS LIMITED 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton Business Park Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Limited 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton Business Park, Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states PHOENIX VLSI CONSULTANTS LIMITED Water Lane Towcester, Northants NN12 7RQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hunt, Peter Charles Appletree Cottage, 3-5 Pilgrims Lane Bugbrooke, Northampton NN7 3PJ / GB | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael, et al Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael, et al Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Holt, Michael, et al European Patents Department, Texas Instruments Limited, PO Box 5069 Northampton NN4 7ZE / GB | ||
Former [1993/44] | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93302685.8 | 06.04.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | GB19920007472 | 06.04.1992 Original published format: GB 9207472 | [1993/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0568206 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0568206 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568206 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/06, H01L21/82, H01L29/41 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
H01L29/456 (EP,US);
H01L21/8249 (EP,US);
H01L27/0623 (EP,US);
H01L29/0821 (EP,US);
H01L29/42304 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/44] | H01L27/06, H01L21/82, H01L29/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/44] | Title | German: | Bipolarer Transistor und Herstellungsverfahren | [1993/44] | English: | Bipolar transistor and method of manufacture | [1993/44] | French: | Transistor bipolaire et procédé de fabrication | [1993/44] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 22.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.07.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Request for further processing for: | 28.06.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.07.2002 | Decision despatched | 08.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 07.08.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.06.1995 | 30.04.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.1996 | 30.04.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.1997 | 30.04.1998 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.1998 | 30.04.2000 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   13.06.2000 | 30.04.2001 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2001 | 30.04.2002 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.2004 | BE | 10.03.2004 | CH | 10.03.2004 | IT | 10.03.2004 | LI | 10.03.2004 | NL | 10.03.2004 | IE | 06.04.2004 | SE | 10.06.2004 | ES | 21.06.2004 | [2008/05] |
Former [2005/24] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
IE | 06.04.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | SE | 10.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0077921 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,6-9,11,15 * page 6, line 8 - page 9, line 35; figure 2A *; | [A]EP0405045 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [A] 1,9-11,15,17* the whole document *; | [A]EP0427253 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,9-11,15,17 * the whole document * | Examination | US4120707 | US5011784 |