EP0566318 - Ink jet printer dot placement compensation method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lexmark International, Inc. 55 Railroad Avenue Greenwich, Connecticut 06836 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states LEXMARK INTERNATIONAL, INC. 55 Railroad Avenue Greenwich, Connecticut 06836 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bolash, John Philip 2416 Brookshire Circle Lexington, KY 40515 / US | 02 /
James III, Edmund Hulin 1120 Andover Forest Drive Lexington, KY 40509 / US | 03 /
Mayo, Randall David 102 Montgomery Avenue Georgetown, KY 40324 / US | 04 /
Zumbach, Richard Gerald 21101 Island Forest Drive, Route 2, Box 590 Davidson, N.C. 28036 / US | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93302772.4 | 08.04.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | US19920870449 | 16.04.1992 Original published format: US 870449 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0566318 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0566318 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0566318 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/51 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
B41J11/42 (EP,US);
B41J2/5056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/42] | Title | German: | Kompensationsverfahren für Bildpunktpositionierung in einem Tintenstrahldrucker | [1993/42] | English: | Ink jet printer dot placement compensation method | [1993/42] | French: | Procédé pour compenser le positionnement des points dans une imprimante à jet d'encre | [1993/42] | Examination procedure | 28.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0185999 (HONEYWELL INF SYSTEMS [IT]) [A] 1-11 * page 4, column 6, line 55 - page 5, column 7, line 66; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4737041 (NAKAYAMA TETSUROH [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 61; figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP0264266 (IBM [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |