EP0566385 - Electromechanical lock arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abloy Security Ltd. Oy Rajasampaanranta 2 SF-00560 Helsinki / FI | [1993/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hurskainen, Oiva Pajupillintie 7 SF-80230 Joensuu / FI | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Newby, John Ross, et al JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Newby, John Ross, et al J.Y. & G.W. Johnson Furnival House 14/18 High Holborn London WC1V 6DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93302895.3 | 14.04.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | FI19920001713 | 16.04.1992 Original published format: FI 921713 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0566385 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0566385 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E05B49/00 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
G07C9/00182 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00634 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00761 (EP,US);
G07C9/0069 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7062 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7079 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7876 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | Elektromechanische Schlossanordnung | [1998/36] | English: | Electromechanical lock arrangement | [1993/42] | French: | Dispositif pour serrure électromécanique | [1993/42] |
Former [1993/42] | Anordnung für elektromechanisches Schloss | Examination procedure | 24.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8000091 (MOSCIATTI R, et al); | [Y]FR2450930 (ANTIVOLS SIMPLEX SA); | [AD]WO8911577 (WAERTSILAE OY AB [FI]); | [Y]EP0432392 (FLIETHER KARL GMBH & CO [DE]) |